Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro da Silva Sampaio

Deceased

Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1572²BornGuarda, Portugal
6 Sep 163260.6AppointedBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
Feb 1633³61.0Ordained BishopBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
19 May 163462.3InstalledBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
15 Apr 1649³77.2DiedBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro da Silva Sampaio:
Bishop Pedro da Silva Sampaio (died ) Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,160
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 303
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015