Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal de Silvestri

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1803Born
15 Mar 185855.0Elevated to Cardinal
18 Mar 185855.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
27 Sep 186158.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
19 Nov 187572.7DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Pietro de Silvestri
Pietro Cardinal de Silvestri (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRovigo, Italy

  • a cardinal for 17.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 50, and Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018