Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Melo e Brito da Silveira Alvim

Deceased

Bishop of Portalegre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1730³BornSinde
28 May 176332.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jun 177342.9SelectedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
12 Jul 177342.9ConfirmedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
3 Oct 177343.2Ordained BishopBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
29 Mar 177443.7InstalledBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
22 Nov 177747.3DiedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Melo e Brito da Silveira Alvim:
Bishop Pedro de Melo e Brito da Silveira Alvim (born , died ) Bishop of Portalegre

  • a priest for 14.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 345
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,492
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015