Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Leone Sieben, C.M. †

Deceased

Superior of Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1886Born
14 Jul 191226.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
27 Jun 193145.3AppointedSuperior of Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
193245.8DiedSuperior of Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Leone Sieben
Father Leone Sieben C.M. (born , died 1932) Superior of Bikoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAverbode, Belgium

  • a priest for 19.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018