Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ignace Grégoire Pierre VI Shahbaddin

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1631²Born
1658²27.0Ordained PriestPriest
1662²31.0Ordained BishopBishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian), Palestine
2 Apr 167847.2ElectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
4 Mar 170271.1DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignace Grégoire Pierre VI Shahbaddin
Patriarch Ignace Grégoire Pierre VI Shahbaddin (born 1631, died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEdessa

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 26 May 2013
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,677
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662
  • b: CB, 15 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017