Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Sforza

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Parma, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1534¹Born
26 Apr 156026.3AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
12 Mar 156531.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 156531.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
1572¹38.0AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
30 Mar 157339.2ResignedBishop of Parma, Italy
16 May 158147.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Parma, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Sforza (VIAF: 54102177)
Alessandro Cardinal Sforza (born 1534, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Parma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMacerata, Diocese of Macerata
Buried Place (Original)Family Sepulchre, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 16.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 270
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 80*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018