Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Celestino Cardinal Sfondrati, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1644Born
26 Apr 166824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Dec 169551.9Elevated to Cardinal
20 Feb 169652.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
4 Sep 169652.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

MicroData Summary for Celestino Sfondrati
Celestino Cardinal Sfondrati O.S.B. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a cardinal for .7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1695

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast