Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Severini

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Dec 1439AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
15 Jul 1444AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
4 Apr 1472DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Severini:
Bishop Antonio Severini (died ) Bishop of Gubbio

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 151, and Page 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013