Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fryderyk Sesselmann

Deceased

Bishop of Lebus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1410¹BornKulmbach
145343.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Nov 145545.8SelectedBishop of Lebus, Germany
1 Dec 145545.9ConfirmedBishop of Lebus, Germany
21 Sep 148373.7DiedBishop of Lebus, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fryderyk Sesselmann:
Bishop Fryderyk Sesselmann (died ) Bishop of Lebus

  • a priest for 30.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013