Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Sequeiros y Sotomayor, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1636³Born
1 Apr 168649.4AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
1 May 169154.5DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Sequeiros y Sotomayor
Bishop Francisco de Sequeiros y Sotomayor O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Miguel de Bouzas, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 147
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 228, Number 1,417
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018