Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Serlupi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1755Born
4 May 180145.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 182367.3Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 182367.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
6 Feb 182872.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

MicroData Summary for Francesco Serlupi (VIAF: 89059847)
Francesco Cardinal Serlupi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, Santissima Concezione Chapel, S. Maria in Aracoeli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a cardinal for 4.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 24 Jun 2019

Quantcast