Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lopo de Sequeira Pereira

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹Born
22 Apr 161946.3ConfirmedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
10 Aug 161946.6InstalledBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
7 Jun 163259.4AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
4 Aug 163663.5DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lopo de Sequeira Pereira
Bishop Lopo de Sequeira Pereira (born 1573, died ) Bishop of Guarda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElvas

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 180, and Page 285
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast