Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Senzasoni

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1674³Born
29 Sep 172551.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 172955.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
28 Feb 174671.9DiedTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Senzasoni
Bishop Giovanni Battista Senzasoni (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNorcia de Spolete

  • a priest for 20.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 297
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast