Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marc Scurra, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹Born
1 Oct 163545.7AppointedBishop of Albania
10 Sep 164050.6AppointedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
27 Apr 165666.3DiedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marc Scurra
Archbishop Marc Scurra O.F.M. (born 1590, died ) Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarraba

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 179, and Page 74
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,635, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast