Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthaeus Scrivanelli

Deceased

Bishop of Ossero (Osor)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1607BornJelsa
12 Mar 163326.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 166760.6AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
Dec 167265.9DiedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Matthaeus Scrivanelli:
Bishop Matthaeus Scrivanelli Bishop of Ossero (Osor)

  • a priest for 39.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 107
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013