Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardino Cardinal Scotti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1655BornMilan, Italy
29 May 171559.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
16 Dec 171560.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Feb 171660.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
28 Oct 171762.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Oct 171762.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 172671.1DiedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Scotti:
Cardinal Bernardino Scotti (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio

  • a priest for 9.0 years
  • a cardinal for 11.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 May 1715

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013