Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von Schwarzburg

Deceased

Bishop of Münster, Germany

Apostolic Administrator of Bremen (and Hamberg)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1440Born
20 Nov 146323.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
Apr 146625.3SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
20 Jun 146625.6ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
24 Dec 149656.1DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Schwarzburg
Bishop Heinrich von Schwarzburg (born , died ) Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRudolstadt

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 194, and Page 110
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1463, Number 56*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast