Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregor Schenk von Osterwitz

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Jun 1396AppointedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
1 Oct 1396Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
9 May 1403DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Gregor Schenk von Osterwitz:
Archbishop Gregor Schenk von Osterwitz (died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013