Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gottschalk Schutte, O.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Curland, Latvia


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jan 1405AppointedBishop of Curland, Latvia
13 Dec 1405Ordained BishopBishop of Curland, Latvia
17 Nov 1424DiedBishop of Curland, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Gottschalk Schutte
Bishop Gottschalk Schutte O.T. (died ) Bishop of Curland

EventPlace
Ordained BishopO.T., Church, Marienburg

  • a bishop for 18.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 220
  • ob: ATh, 27 Mar 2019
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,038

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 Apr 2019

Quantcast