Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph von Schrofenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jul 1501AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
3 Mar 1509SucceededBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
26 Jan 1511Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 1511Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
29 Mar 1521DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Christoph von Schrofenstein
Bishop Christoph von Schrofenstein (died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Ordained PriestCathedral, Brixen, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Brixen, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 10.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 111
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 141
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,813
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1511, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 17 May 2018

Quantcast