Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Nikolaus Schönig, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1867²Born
1907²40.0AppointedPro-Prefect of Togo
20 Mar 191043.2AppointedPrefect of Togo
16 Mar 191447.2ResignedPrefect of Togo
1925²58.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Togo

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Schönig
Father Nikolaus Schönig S.V.D. (born 1867, died 1925) Prefect Emeritus of Togo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGermany

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: CB, 21 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 22 Dec 2018

Quantcast