Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Schoning

Deceased

Archbishop of Riga, Latvia


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Mar 1528SelectedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
18 Jan 1531ConfirmedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
10 Aug 1539DiedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Thomas Schoning
Archbishop Thomas Schoning (died ) Archbishop of Riga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 285
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,531, Number 2*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast