Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Schönhofer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

Titular Bishop of Salona


Events

DateEventTitle
17 May 1473AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
17 May 1473AppointedTitular Bishop of Salona
30 May 1473Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Salona
7 Jul 1493DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Albert Schönhofer:
Bishop Albert Schönhofer (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 228
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,525

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013