Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Schneider (Sartorius, Wilmecker), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Tiflis


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Apr 1507AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
19 Apr 1507AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiflis
30 May 1507Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiflis
27 Mar 1551DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Schneider (Sartorius, Wilmecker)
Bishop Johannes Schneider (Sartorius, Wilmecker) O.F.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

  • a bishop for 43.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast