Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Schleinitz

Deceased

Bishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1470Born
27 Apr 151848.3SelectedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
5 Jul 151848.5ConfirmedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
18 Oct 151848.7Ordained BishopBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
13 Oct 153767.7DiedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Schleinitz
Bishop Johann von Schleinitz (born 1470, died ) Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRagewitz

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast