Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von Schaumberg

Deceased

Bishop of Minden, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
6 May 1473SelectedBishop of Minden, Germany
30 Jul 1473ConfirmedBishop of Minden, Germany
20 Mar 1474Ordained PriestPriest of Minden, Germany
1 May 1474Ordained BishopBishop of Minden, Germany
25 Jan 1508DiedBishop of Minden, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Schaumberg
Bishop Heinrich von Schaumberg (died ) Bishop of Minden

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,617
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018