Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johann Schäfer, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Pro-Prefect Emeritus of Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1857Born
4 Jun 189234.4AppointedPro-Prefect of Togo
2 Jun 189436.4ResignedPro-Prefect of Togo
10 Jun 193072.4DiedPro-Prefect Emeritus of Togo

MicroData Summary for Johann Schäfer
Father Johann Schäfer S.V.D. (born , died ) Pro-Prefect Emeritus of Togo

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast