Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vincent Scarpa

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Belluno e Feltre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1790BornEste
19 Sep 181222.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Jun 181323.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jan 185463.5SelectedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
7 Apr 185463.8ConfirmedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
5 May 185463.9DiedBishop-Elect of Belluno e Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincent Scarpa:
Priest Vincent Scarpa (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Belluno e Feltre

  • a priest for 40.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013