Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Scarampi

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1516¹BornAcqui
20 Aug 154630.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nola, Italy
1549¹33.0SucceededBishop of Nola, Italy
15 Dec 156448.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
15 May 156650.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
9 Mar 156953.1AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
30 Jul 157660.5DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Scarampi
Bishop Antonio Scarampi (born 1516, died ) Bishop of Lodi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 260
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016