Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abel de Saint-Brieuc, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Reims, France

Titular Bishop of Dionysias


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Oct 1483AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
22 Oct 1483AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
21 Dec 1483Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias

MicroData Summary for Abel de Saint-Brieuc
Bishop Abel de Saint-Brieuc O.P. , Auxiliary Bishop of Reims

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt Louis des Français, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1483, Number 11
  • ob: CB, 31 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast