Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enea Cardinal Sbarretti

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1808BornSpoleto, Italy
12 Mar 187769.1Elevated to Cardinal
20 Mar 187769.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
1 May 188476.3DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Enea Sbarretti:
Cardinal Enea Sbarretti (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 7.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013