Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Maurizio di Savoia

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (resigned cardinalate)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1593Born
10 Dec 160714.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 162128.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
19 Apr 162128.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
16 Mar 162633.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
164248.9ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
4 Oct 165764.7Died

MicroData Summary for Maurizio di Savoia
(Layman) Maurizio di Savoia (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTurin, Italy

  • a cardinal for 34.0 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Dec 1607

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018