Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Savelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1422¹Born
15 May 148058.3Elevated to Cardinal
Jun 1480²58.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
17 Mar 148462.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
31 Aug 149270.6AppointedAdministrator of Mallorca, Spain
27 Mar 149371.2ResignedAdministrator of Mallorca, Spain
18 Sep 149876.7DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Savelli
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Savelli (born 1422, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 18.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 May 1480

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018