Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Savelli

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1554AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
6 Feb 1556AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
19 Sep 1599DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mariano Savelli (VIAF: 89387878)
Bishop Mariano Savelli (died ) Bishop of Gubbio

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 256, and Page 193
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1556, Number 5*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018