Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André de Sauzay

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582¹BornAunonay, France
23 Oct 162341.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
18 Feb 162442.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
13 Apr 164462.2DiedTitular Bishop of Bethleem

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André de Sauzay:
Bishop André de Sauzay (died ) Titular Bishop of Bethleem

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 24 Feb 2015