Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Satta

Deceased

Bishop of Iglesias, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1708³Born
10 Apr 173425.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 176354.9SelectedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
26 Sep 176355.1ConfirmedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
6 Jan 176455.4Ordained BishopBishop of Iglesias, Italy
Apr 1772³63.6DiedBishop of Iglesias, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Satta
Bishop Luigi Satta (born , died Apr 1772) Bishop of Iglesias

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrgosolo

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 204
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018