Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lucio Cardinal Sassi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ripatransone, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1521Born
3 Oct 157149.9AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
20 May 157553.5ResignedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
17 Sep 159371.9Elevated to Cardinal
11 Oct 159371.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
29 Feb 160482.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Ripatransone, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Lucio Sassi
Lucio Cardinal Sassi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ripatransone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNola, Diocese of Nola
Buried Place (Original)St. John Lateran, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 10.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1593
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 285
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1571, Number 17*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018