Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Sarmiento Mendoza

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1525BornBurgos
4 Jun 157449.0AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
27 May 158055.0AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
9 Jun 159570.0DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Sarmiento Mendoza:
Bishop Francisco Sarmiento Mendoza (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,809

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013