Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro a São Agostinho, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Coimbra

Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹BornFaro
10 Nov 163212.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
22 Jun 167151.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal
22 Jun 167151.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
2 Jan 167555.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro a São Agostinho
Bishop Pedro a São Agostinho O.F.M. (born 1620, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Coimbra

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 170
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 72
  • b: CB, 26 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.2, 25 Jan 2016; Data: 27 Jan 2016