Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vincenzo Cardinal Santucci

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Studies

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1796Born
26 Feb 184448.0AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
1 Aug 184650.4ResignedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
24 Jul 184751.4AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
11 Jul 185054.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
Apr 1851³55.1ResignedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
7 Mar 185357.0Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 185357.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
23 Jun 185458.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
14 Nov 185660.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
19 Aug 186165.5DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Santucci (VIAF: 89423118)
Vincenzo Cardinal Santucci (born , died ) Prefect of Studies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGorga, Italy
Death PlaceRocca di Papa

  • a cardinal for 8.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 55
  • x933/xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 21, and Page 30, and Page 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast