Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Santander, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Oct 1630SelectedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
10 Feb 1631ConfirmedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
24 Jan 1644DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Santander
Bishop Juan de Santander O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Mallorca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastro Urdiales

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 228
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 154, Number 977
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018