Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Federico Cardinal Sanseverino

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Novara, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1475¹Born
5 Nov 14816.8AppointedAdministrator of Maillezais, France
9 Mar 148914.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
26 Jul 149217.5Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jul 149217.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro
8 Feb 149621.1AppointedAdministrator of Thérouanne, France
1 Jul 149722.5AppointedAdministrator of Vienne, France
12 Nov 149823.8ResignedAdministrator of Thérouanne, France
30 May 150530.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Novara, Italy
1508²33.0ResignedAdministrator of Maillezais, France
1 May 151035.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
17 May 151136.3ResignedCardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro
24 Oct 151136.8ResignedApostolic Administrator of Novara, Italy
24 Mar 151439.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro
26 Jan 151540.0ResignedAdministrator of Vienne, France
7 Aug 151641.5DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Novara, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Federico Sanseverino (VIAF: 304921012)
Federico Cardinal Sanseverino (born 1475, died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria in Aracoeli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 27.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 260
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Mar 1489
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 268, and Page 184
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1481, Number 45*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast