Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Grzegorz z Sanoka

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1407¹Born
17 Mar 145144.2AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
4 Jul 145144.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
29 Jan 147770.0DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Grzegorz z Sanoka:
Archbishop Grzegorz z Sanoka (died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,891

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015