Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Moritz von Sandizell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Freising, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1514¹Born
12 Jun 155945.4SelectedBishop of Freising, Germany
13 Mar 156046.1ConfirmedBishop of Freising, Germany
2 Mar 156147.1Ordained BishopBishop of Freising, Germany
18 Oct 156652.7ResignedBishop of Freising, Germany
26 Feb 156753.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Freising, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Moritz von Sandizell (VIAF: 81185119)
Bishop Moritz von Sandizell (born 1514, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Freising

  • a bishop for 5.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 198

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018