Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Sandford

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Dec 1226AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
9 May 1227Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
24 Feb 1235DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry Sandford
Bishop Henry Sandford (died ) Bishop of Rochester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPalace, Canterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 56
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 560
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,539

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast