Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo Sánchez Mercado

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Oct 1511AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
12 Jan 1530AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
25 Jan 1548DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo Sánchez Mercado
Bishop Rodrigo Sánchez Mercado (died ) Bishop of Ávila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOńate, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1,500, Page 27, Number 84
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 233, and Page 92
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1511, Number 24*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast