Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Sancio

Deceased

Bishop of L’Aquila, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jul 1538AppointedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
1 Apr 1539Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
1552¹DiedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Sancio
Bishop Bernardo Sancio (died 1552) Bishop of L’Aquila

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint Peter, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 12.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 113
  • ob: AT, 19 Dec 2016
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,115
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1539, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast