Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso de Salizanes y Medina, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618²BornZamora
4 Nov 166850.8SelectedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
4 Feb 166951.1ConfirmedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
13 Jul 167052.5Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
18 Nov 167557.9AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
19 Nov 168567.9DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Salizanes y Medina:
Bishop Alfonso de Salizanes y Medina O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 172, and Page 300
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 206, Number 1,288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013