Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Salviati

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1490BornFlorence
1 Jul 151727.3Elevated to Cardinal
13 Nov 151727.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
8 Feb 151827.9AppointedAdministrator of Fermo, Italy
12 Sep 152030.5AppointedAdministrator of Ferrara, Italy
24 Aug 152131.4AppointedAdministrator of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
16 Oct 152131.6ResignedAdministrator of Fermo, Italy
18 Mar 152333.0ResignedAdministrator of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
20 Jul 153040.3AppointedAdministrator of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
21 Jun 153141.2AppointedAdministrator of Teano, Italy
15 Nov 153141.6AppointedAdministrator of Santa Severina, Italy
10 Jan 153241.8AppointedAdministrator of Bitetto, France
15 Mar 153242.0ResignedAdministrator of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
17 Feb 153544.9AppointedAdministrator of Vaison, France
30 Apr 153545.1ResignedAdministrator of Teano, Italy
14 Jun 153545.2ResignedAdministrator of Santa Severina, Italy
15 May 153646.1ResignedAdministrator of Vaison, France
12 Aug 153848.4AppointedAdministrator of Saint-Papoul, France
5 Mar 153948.9ResignedAdministrator of Bitetto, France
8 Jan 154352.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
17 Oct 154454.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
8 Oct 154656.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
5 Jun 154959.2ResignedAdministrator of Saint-Papoul, France
1 May 155060.1ResignedAdministrator of Ferrara, Italy
28 Oct 155363.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Salviati:
Cardinal Giovanni Salviati (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a cardinal for 36.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 311, and Page 327
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 269, and Page 298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013