Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Saluzzo

Deceased

Bishop of Accia and Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1674BornAlbaro
25 Sep 170127.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 171540.6AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
3 Jul 172045.9AppointedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
1747¹72.4DiedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Saluzzo:
Bishop Agostino Saluzzo (born , died 1747) Bishop of Accia and Mariana

  • a priest for 45.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 76, and Page 256
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015